Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 08/10/2010