Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/30/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/30/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/30/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/30/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/30/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/30/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/15/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/22/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/22/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/22/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/25/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/25/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/25/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/25/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/25/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/2010