Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/24/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2010