Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/31/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/29/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/29/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/14/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/22/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/28/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/05/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/05/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 03/03/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/10/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/15/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/13/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/19/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/19/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/19/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2010