Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/16/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/26/2010