Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/28/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/22/2009