There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Health Equity and Accountability Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Health Empowerment Zone Act of 2009
  • Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the health of minority individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
06/18/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Rural Development, Biotechnology, Specialty Crops, and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
08/19/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/03/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/07/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/26/2009Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Referred to House Natural Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/26/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/07/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/19/2010

Committees (8)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/26/2009 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/07/2009 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/26/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor06/26/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary06/26/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties08/19/2009 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/26/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services06/26/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/03/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs06/26/2009 Referred to
House Agriculture06/26/2009 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Rural Development, Biotechnology, Specialty Crops, and Foreign Agriculture06/18/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3090.


Subjects (67)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3090. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2009)

Health Equity and Accountability Act of 2009 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Director of the Agency for Healthcare Research and Quality, to establish the Robert T. Matsui Center for Cultural and Linguistic Competence in Health Care.

Provides for health care workforce diversity activities, including the establishment of: (1) a national working group on workforce diversity; (2) an aggregated database on health professional students; and (3) the Advisory Committee on Health Professions Training for Diversity.

Requires health-related programs of the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to collect data on race, ethnicity, primary language, and sexual orientation.

Directs each federal health agency to implement a strategic plan to eliminate disparities on the basis of race, ethnicity, and primary language and improve the health and health care of minority populations.

Prohibits discrimination under any health care service or research program or activity receiving federal financial assistance on the basis of sex, race, color, national origin, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability status.

Requires the establishment of: (1) an Office of Health Disparities within the Office of Civil Rights; (2) civil rights compliance offices in HHS agencies that administer health programs; and (3) an Office of Minority Health within specified agencies.

Reestablishes the Indian Health Service within the Public Health Service of HHS to be administered by the Assistant Secretary of Indian Health.

Directs the President to execute, administer, and enforce provisions to address environmental justice in minority and low-income populations.

Health Empowerment Zone Act of 2009 - Provides for the establishment of health empowerment zones in communities that experience disproportionate disparities in health status and health care.

Sets forth programs to reduce health disparities, including by: (1) expanding the Minority HIV/AIDS initiative; (2) establishing the Rural Health Quality Advisory Commission; and (3) revising eligibility requirements for federal assistance programs with respect to individuals lawfully present in the United States.

Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Act of 2009 - Requires the Secretary to implement the Lung Cancer Mortality Reduction Program to achieve a reduction of at least 25% in the mortality rate of lung cancer by 2015.

Provides for research and other activities with respect to diabetes in minority populations.