Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/14/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/14/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/21/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/02/2009