Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 01/07/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/07/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/07/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/07/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/09/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/09/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/09/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/09/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/09/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/13/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/13/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/13/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/14/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/14/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/14/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/15/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/15/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/15/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/15/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/15/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/21/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/21/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/21/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 01/21/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/21/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/21/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/21/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/26/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/26/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/27/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/27/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/27/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/27/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/27/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/27/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/27/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/27/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/28/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/28/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/28/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/28/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/28/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/28/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/10/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/10/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/10/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/10/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/11/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/11/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/12/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/12/2009
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/12/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/23/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/05/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/12/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/23/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/25/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew