Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/17/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/30/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/30/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/07/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/18/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/02/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/27/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/27/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/22/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/22/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/24/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/24/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/24/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/24/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/09/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/11/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/16/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/16/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/20/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/25/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/09/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/24/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/01/2010