Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/08/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/08/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/08/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/22/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/22/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/10/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/19/2010