Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/27/2010