Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/31/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/16/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/21/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/21/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/25/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/25/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/25/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/29/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/01/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/28/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/28/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/02/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/03/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/06/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/12/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/12/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/10/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/14/2010