Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/07/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 07/07/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/08/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/09/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/09/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/09/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/13/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/20/2009