Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/27/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2009