Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/17/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/23/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/23/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/23/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/23/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/23/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/08/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/12/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/14/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/16/2010