Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/21/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/22/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/22/2009