Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/17/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/17/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/17/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/20/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/20/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/20/2010