Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/23/2010