There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Caregiver Assistance and Resource Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Caregiver Assistance and Resource Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Caregiver Assistance and Resource Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide certain caregivers of veterans with training, support, and medical care, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/27/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8822-8823)
07/23/2009Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-224.
07/09/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/28/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/27/2009-2:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/2009-2:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8822-8823)
07/27/2009-2:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3155.
07/27/2009-2:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8822-8825)
07/27/2009-2:42pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/23/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
07/23/2009HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-224.
07/15/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/15/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/09/2009HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/09/2009HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/09/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/09/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/09/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/09/2009 Referred to
07/15/2009 Markup by
07/23/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-224
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/09/2009 Referred to
07/09/2009 Markup by
07/09/2009 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/28/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3155.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3155. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/27/2009)

Caregiver Assistance and Resource Enhancement Act - (Sec. 2) Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to develop and carry out a program of support services for family and non-family caregivers providing noninstitutional extended care to disabled veterans enrolled in the VA health care system. Requires such support services to include: (1) educational sessions, stipends, and access to support services; (2) counseling and related services; (3) respite care; (4) medical care for family caregivers; and (5) travel expenses in connection with the outpatient care of such veterans. Requires the Secretary to: (1) conduct outreach to inform disabled veterans and their families of services available for caregivers, as well as the ability of a caregiver to be trained and certified by a home health care agency in order to be paid for providing such services; (2) submit to the congressional veterans' committees a plan for implementation of such program; and (3) report annually thereafter for five years on plan implementation.

(Sec. 3) Makes counseling and mental health services available to family and non-family caregivers of enrolled veterans.

(Sec. 4) Directs the Secretary to ensure that respite care meets the needs of the veteran receiving such care, including 24-hour home respite care, and is appropriate with respect to the veteran's age.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes the provision of medical care through the VA for family caregivers of eligible veterans, if the caregiver is without health insurance and ineligible for other public health insurance. Defines a "family caregiver" as an individual who provides care to a veteran who was deployed in support of Operations Iraqi Freedom or Enduring Freedom and are determined by the Secretary to: (1) have a severe service-connected disability or illness; (2) be in need of caregiver services since, without such services, the veteran would require hospitalization, nursing home care, or other residential institutional care; and (3) be unable to carry out the activities of daily living.

(Sec. 6) Authorizes a lodging and subsistence allowance for family caregivers of eligible veterans described above, to cover the time in which the veteran is traveling to and from a treatment facility as well as the duration of the treatment period.

(Sec. 7) Requires the Secretary to: (1) at least once every three years, design and conduct a survey of family and non-family caregivers; (2) consider survey findings when carrying out programs related to caregivers; and (3) report to the veterans' committees on survey results and services made available to caregivers.