Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/28/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009