Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 07/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/09/2009