Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/16/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/16/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/16/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/16/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/16/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/16/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/16/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/16/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/16/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/16/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/16/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/20/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/29/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/09/2009