Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2010