Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/13/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/13/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/14/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/14/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/14/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/14/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/14/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/14/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/30/2010