Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 07/10/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/28/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/23/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/02/2010