Refine your search

Showing 11 of 11 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/28/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-85.
10/28/2009 Signed by President.
10/21/2009 Presented to President.
10/15/2009 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 80 - 17. Record Vote Number: 322.
10/01/2009 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 308 - 114 (Roll no. 752).(consideration: CR H10432-10433)
09/30/2009 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 111-278 filed.(text of conference report: CR H10150-10358)
09/30/2009 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
07/29/2009 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Dorgan; Byrd; Murray; Feinstein; Johnson; Landrieu; Reed; Lautenberg; Harkin; Tester; Inouye; Bennett; Cochran; McConnell; Bond; Hutchison; Shelby; Alexander; Voinovich.
07/29/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 85 - 9. Record Vote Number: 248.(text: CR 7/30/2009 S8609-8618)
07/17/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 320 - 97 (Roll no. 592).
07/13/2009 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 111-203, by Mr. Pastor (AZ).