Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/13/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 07/13/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/13/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/13/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 07/13/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/15/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/25/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/11/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/18/2010
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/20/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/09/2010