There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

EMT Act of 2010
Emergency Medic Transition Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to House

EMT Act of 2010
Emergency Medic Transition Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Medic Transition (EMT) Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide grants to State emergency medical service departments to provide for the expedited training and licensing of veterans with prior medical training, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/23/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 5 (Roll no. 542).(text: CR 9/22/2010 H6839)
09/16/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-608.
07/14/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
09/24/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
09/23/2010-3:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2010-3:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 5 (Roll no. 542). (text: CR 9/22/2010 H6839)
09/23/2010-3:20pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6940-6941)
09/22/2010-4:39pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/22/2010-4:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3199.
09/22/2010-4:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6839-6842)
09/22/2010-4:22pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/16/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 353.
09/16/2010HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-608.
07/28/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/28/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/22/2010HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/22/2010HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
07/15/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/14/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/14/2009HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1760)
07/14/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/29/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/28/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/14/2009 Referred to
07/28/2010 Markup by
09/16/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-608
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/15/2009 Referred to
07/22/2010 Markup by
07/22/2010 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions09/24/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3199.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3199. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/23/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 16, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Emergency Medic Transition Act of 2010 or the EMT Act of 2010 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish a program of awarding grants to states to assist veterans who received and completed military emergency medical training while serving in the U.S. Armed Forces to become, upon their discharge or release from active duty service, state-licensed or certified emergency medical technicians. Allows such funds to be used to: (1) provide such veterans required course work and training (that takes into account, and is not duplicative of, medical course work and training already received) to satisfy emergency medical services personnel certification requirements in the civilian sector; (2) provide reimbursement for costs associated with such course work and training and with applying for licensure or certification; (3) expedite the licensing or certification process; and (4) enter into an agreement with an educational institution to provide course work and training under this Act. Requires a state, to be eligible for a grant under this Act, to demonstrate that it has a shortage of emergency medical technicians.

Directs the Comptroller General to: (1) study the barriers experienced by such veterans seeking to become licensed or certified in a state as civilian health professionals; and (2) report to Congress on the results of such study, including recommendations on whether the program under this Act should be expanded to assist veterans seeking to become licensed or certified in a state as health providers other than emergency medical technicians.