Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/16/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/21/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/21/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 10/29/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/16/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 01/21/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/03/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/29/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/27/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2010