Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/19/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/09/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 02/02/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/18/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/22/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/10/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/28/2010