Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/17/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/17/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/20/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/22/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/23/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/27/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/27/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/27/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/27/2009