Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/15/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/04/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/08/2010