Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/21/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 11/18/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 11/18/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/03/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/17/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/15/2010