Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/30/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/30/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/30/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/30/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/30/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/07/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/13/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/06/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/13/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/03/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/26/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/26/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/09/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/12/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/06/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/19/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2010