Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/29/2009