Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/29/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/25/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/23/2010