Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/20/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/27/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/27/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/27/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/30/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/10/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/15/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/22/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/20/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/28/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/18/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 01/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/04/2010