Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/27/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/30/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/31/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/10/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/10/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/10/2009