Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/21/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/21/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/21/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/21/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/23/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/23/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/24/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/15/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/15/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/16/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/23/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/23/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/23/2009