Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/17/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/17/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/27/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 11/03/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/20/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/10/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew