Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/27/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010