Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/20/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/15/2009