Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/22/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/20/2010