Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/20/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/20/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/26/2010