Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/08/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/10/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/25/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/01/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/01/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/01/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/15/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/17/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/13/2009