Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/22/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/22/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/30/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/14/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/20/2010