Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 07/21/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/16/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/23/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/24/2009