Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/22/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/27/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/09/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/09/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/09/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/16/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/25/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/25/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/29/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/13/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/13/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/13/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/20/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/23/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/28/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/28/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/28/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/01/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/11/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/11/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/15/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/03/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/15/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/15/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/19/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 04/22/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/18/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/10/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/24/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/28/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/28/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/30/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/01/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/15/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/21/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/09/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/23/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/23/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/09/2010