Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/22/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/27/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/11/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/16/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/14/2010